Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1393 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2023

                    By: Middleton S.B. No. 1393
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 28, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 28, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1393 By:  Middleton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for coverage by the Fair Access to
 Insurance Requirements Plan in certain areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2211.151, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2211.151.  MANDATORY COVERAGE PROVIDED TO CERTAIN
 INSUREDS.  (a)  The association shall make residential property
 insurance available to each applicant in an underserved area whose
 property is insurable in accordance with reasonable underwriting
 standards but who, after diligent efforts, is unable to obtain
 residential property insurance through the voluntary market, as
 evidenced by two declinations from insurers authorized to engage in
 the business of, and writing, residential property insurance in
 this state.
 (b)  For residential properties in the area surrounding, but
 not located more than four miles beyond, the Texas Windstorm
 Insurance Association catastrophe area designated under Section
 2210.005, an offer of coverage for the property through the
 voluntary market at a cost that exceeds 110 percent of the cost for
 an association policy providing substantially equivalent coverage
 of residential property with similar rating characteristics,
 including size, elevation, age, and construction standards, is
 considered a declination for purposes of establishing eligibility
 for coverage under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *