Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1414 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2023

                    By: Johnson, et al. S.B. No. 1414
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; March 29, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 29, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1414 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the temporary regulation of the practice of veterinary
 medicine by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 801.003, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 801.003.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The State Board of
 Veterinary Medical Examiners is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the board is abolished September 1, 2027 [2029].
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 801, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter A-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER A-1. TEMPORARY REGULATION BY TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
 LICENSING AND REGULATION
 Sec. 801.021.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission of
 Licensing and Regulation.
 (2)  "Department" means the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation.
 Sec. 801.022.  TEMPORARY ADMINISTRATION OF CHAPTER BY
 DEPARTMENT; RULES.  (a) Notwithstanding any other law, the
 department shall assume all policy-making powers of the board and
 administer this chapter.  The department may contract as necessary
 to administer this chapter.
 (b)  A power or duty granted to the board under this chapter
 is a power or duty of the executive director of the department, the
 department, or the commission, as applicable.
 (c)  The commission or executive director of the department
 may delegate, or withdraw any delegation of, any power or duty under
 this chapter to the board or the executive director of the board.
 The delegation or withdrawal of delegation must be in writing.
 (d)  The commission may not adopt a new rule relating to the
 scope of practice of or a health-related standard of care for the
 practice of the profession of veterinary medicine unless the rule
 has been proposed by the board under Section 801.024(c).  For a rule
 described by this subsection, the commission shall either adopt the
 rule as proposed or return the rule to the board for revision.
 (e)  The commission retains authority for final adoption of
 all rules and is responsible for ensuring compliance with all laws
 regarding the rulemaking process.
 (f)  Not later than December 31, 2026, the department shall
 conduct a review under Section 2001.039, Government Code, of each
 rule under 22 T.A.C. Part 24. In conducting the review under this
 subsection, the department shall ensure that license holders and
 the public have a meaningful opportunity to provide input and
 recommend changes to the rules.
 (g)  The department shall propose necessary amendments to a
 rule, or the repeal of a rule, for which the department determines
 the board lacks a sufficient reason or authority to adopt or
 enforce.
 Sec. 801.023.  SEPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE FUNCTIONS OF
 BOARD. (a) The executive director of the department shall direct
 and may dismiss the executive director of the board. The presiding
 officer of the commission shall appoint a replacement executive
 director of the board if necessary.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (a), the executive director of the
 board is responsible for the administration of financial services,
 human resources, and workforce development duties of the board,
 including:
 (1)  accounts payable and accounts receivable;
 (2)  budgeting, inventory, and asset management;
 (3)  payroll;
 (4)  personnel and labor issues;
 (5)  purchasing;
 (6)  recruitment, evaluation, selection, training, and
 promotion of personnel;
 (7)  submitting required reports regarding finances,
 performance measures, strategic planning, legislative
 appropriations requests, operating budgets, and similar
 information as required by law;
 (8)  legal support services, including responding to
 requests for public information; and
 (9)  information technology and support.
 (c)  If the department provides any of the functions listed
 in Subsection (b), the board shall reimburse the department for
 administrative costs incurred in providing those services.
 Sec. 801.024.  ADVISORY BOARD. (a)  Notwithstanding
 Subchapter D, the board is an advisory board to the department.
 (b)  The board, the equine dental provider advisory
 committee, and any advisory committee appointed under Section
 801.163 shall provide advice and recommendations to the department
 on technical matters relevant to the administration of this
 chapter.
 (c)  The board shall propose rules to the commission relating
 to the scope of practice of or a health-related standard of care for
 the practice of the profession of veterinary medicine.
 Sec. 801.025.  CONFLICT WITH OTHER LAW. (a)
 Notwithstanding Section 51.003, to the extent of any conflict
 between this chapter and Chapter 51, this chapter controls.
 (b)  To the extent of any conflict between this subchapter
 and another provision of this chapter, this subchapter controls.
 Sec. 801.026.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Board" means the State Board of Veterinary
 Medical Examiners.
 (2)  "Department" means the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation.
 (b)  Not later than October 1, 2023, the Department of
 Information Resources shall consult with the department and the
 board to assess the database needs of the board and establish a plan
 for the procurement and acquisition of a database suitable to
 address those needs.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other law, the board shall provide
 the Department of Information Resources and the department with
 access to any system, hardware, software, documents, or information
 necessary to achieve the purposes of Subsection (b) of this
 section.
 (d)  The provision of information under this section to the
 Department of Information Resources or the department does not
 waive confidentiality or privilege.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than December 1, 2024, the Texas
 Department of Licensing and Regulation shall submit to the Sunset
 Advisory Commission and each standing committee of the legislature
 with primary jurisdiction over the State Board of Veterinary
 Medical Examiners any legislative recommendations necessary to
 improve the board's operations.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *