Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1464 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/05/2023

                    By: West, et al. S.B. No. 1464
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 5, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 1; April 5, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting a retail seller of motor vehicles from
 imposing certain restrictions on the purchase of a motor vehicle.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 348, Finance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 348.415 to read as follows:
 Sec. 348.415.  RESTRICTIONS ON CASH PURCHASES OR THIRD-PARTY
 FINANCING PROHIBITED.  (a)  A retail seller may not increase the
 cash price of a motor vehicle for a buyer who purchases a motor
 vehicle with:
 (1)  the buyer's own money; or
 (2)  a loan from a third-party lender.
 (b)  A retail seller may not prohibit a prospective buyer
 from paying the cash price at the time of sale with:
 (1)  the prospective buyer's own money; or
 (2)  a loan from a third-party lender.
 (c)  A retail seller may not make a false or misleading
 representation that is inconsistent with this section.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an agreement entered into on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *