Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1467 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/18/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 1467
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 18, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1467 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure of certain medical information by
 electronic means.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle I, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 183 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 183.  DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN MEDICAL INFORMATION BY
 ELECTRONIC MEANS
 Sec. 183.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Electronic health record" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 531.901, Government Code.
 (2)  "Electronic means" means publishing information
 on a secure electronic network or Internet website, including a
 secure online patient portal or health software application:
 (A)  that is accessible by an electronic device,
 including a computer, mobile device, or tablet; and
 (B)  at which the patient or patient
 representative has consented to receive the patient's billing or
 medical records.
 (3)  "Patient" has the meaning assigned by Section
 159.001, Occupations Code.
 (4)  "Patient representative" means a person described
 by Sections 159.005(a)(2)-(4), Occupations Code.
 (5)  "Sensitive test result" means a:
 (A)  pathology report or radiology report that has
 a reasonable likelihood of showing a finding of malignancy; or
 (B)  test result that may reveal a genetic marker.
 Sec. 183.002.  SENSITIVE TEST RESULTS DISCLOSED BY
 ELECTRONIC MEANS.  (a)  A person may not disclose sensitive test
 results by electronic means to a patient or patient representative
 before the third day after the date the test results are finalized.
 (b)  A person who administers or controls the electronic
 health record of a patient shall ensure compliance with the
 prohibition imposed by Subsection (a).
 (c)  A person is not subject to civil, criminal, or
 administrative liability or professional disciplinary action for
 failure to comply with Section 159.006(d)(2), Occupations Code, or
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 159.006(d), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  A physician shall provide the information requested
 under this section:
 (1)  not later than the 15th business day after the date
 of receipt of the written consent for release under Subsection (a)
 or the written request under Subsection (c); and
 (2)  in accordance with Section 183.002, Health and
 Safety Code, if applicable.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 183, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to the disclosure of test results on or after
 the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Section 159.006, Occupations Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies to a request for information under that section
 made on or after the effective date of this Act. A request made
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the request was made, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *