Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1484 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

                    S.B. No. 1484


 AN ACT
 relating to a border operations training program for peace officers
 employed by local law enforcement agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.02093 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.02093.  BORDER OPERATIONS TRAINING PROGRAM. (a)
 The department, in coordination with local law enforcement
 agencies, shall establish and administer a border operations
 training program for peace officers employed by local law
 enforcement agencies that will prepare the officers to:
 (1)  collaborate and cooperate with and assist any law
 enforcement agency in the interdiction, investigation, and
 prosecution of criminal activity in the Texas-Mexico border region;
 and
 (2)  collaborate and cooperate with and assist district
 attorneys, county attorneys, the border prosecution unit, and other
 prosecutors in the investigation and prosecution of allegations of
 criminal activity in the Texas-Mexico border region.
 (b)  The training program under Subsection (a) must include:
 (1)  information on:
 (A)  criminal activity occurring along the
 Texas-Mexico border, including drug trafficking and trafficking of
 persons and other activity carried out by cartels, transnational
 gangs, and other groups engaged in organized criminal activity; and
 (B)  methods for identifying northbound,
 southbound, and intrastate criminal activity associated with drug
 trafficking, trafficking of persons, and other organized criminal
 activity, including the provision of services to victims of
 trafficking;
 (2)  best practices for investigating and prosecuting
 the criminal activity described by Subdivision (1) and securing the
 Texas-Mexico border; and
 (3)  an overview of the department's operations at the
 Texas-Mexico border, including any collaboration with the United
 States Customs and Border Protection.
 (c)  The department shall identify opportunities for a peace
 officer described by Subsection (a) to assist in the department's
 duties related to border operations. The department may authorize
 the officer to assist in carrying out those duties.
 (d)  A peace officer authorized by the department to assist
 in carrying out duties related to the department's border
 operations as described by Subsection (c) is not entitled to
 compensation from the department for the assistance provided.
 (e)  The department may partner with federal agencies in
 administering the training program under Subsection (a) and
 facilitating any assistance provided by a peace officer under
 Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.359 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.359.  BORDER OPERATIONS TRAINING PROGRAM. The
 commission may:
 (1)  recognize, or with the consent of the Department
 of Public Safety administer or assist in administering, the border
 operations training program established under Section 411.02093,
 Government Code, as a continuing education program for officers;
 and
 (2)  credit an officer who successfully completes the
 program described by Subdivision (1) with the appropriate number of
 continuing education hours.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1484 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1484 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 6, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 96, Nays 40,
 one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor