Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1489 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2023

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1489
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 April 27, 2023, reported favorably from Committee on Education by
 the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 3; April 27, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting the investment of the permanent university
 fund, the national research university fund, or money held by a
 public institution of higher education in financial companies that
 boycott certain energy companies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.0031, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Chapter 809, Government Code, applies to a governing
 board as if the governing board were a state governmental entity
 under that chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 62.143, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Chapter 809, Government Code, applies to the national
 research university fund as if the fund were a state governmental
 entity under that chapter.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 66, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 66.015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 66.015.  PROHIBITION ON INVESTMENT IN FINANCIAL
 COMPANIES THAT BOYCOTT CERTAIN ENERGY COMPANIES. Notwithstanding
 Section 66.01, Chapter 809, Government Code, applies to the
 permanent university fund as if the fund were a state governmental
 entity under that chapter.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *