Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1499 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1499


 AN ACT
 relating to the funding of certain port projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 55, Transportation Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 55.  FUNDING OF PORT DEVELOPMENT AND INFRASTRUCTURE
 [SECURITY,] PROJECTS, PORT CONNECTIVITY PROJECTS, AND STUDIES
 SECTION 2.  Sections 55.001(4-a) and (5), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (4-a)  "Port connectivity [access improvement]
 project" means the construction or improvement of public roadways
 that will enhance connectivity to ports.
 (5)  "Port development and infrastructure [security,
 transportation, or facility] project" means an infrastructure,
 security, transportation, or facility [a] project that is necessary
 or convenient for the proper operation of a maritime port and that
 will improve the security, movement, and intermodal transportation
 of cargo or passengers in commerce and trade.
 SECTION 3.  Section 55.002, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a), (c), and (e) and adding Subsection (f)
 to read as follows:
 (a)  From money in the fund, the department shall fund:
 (1)  port development and infrastructure [security,
 transportation, or facility] projects; and
 (2)  maritime port studies.
 (c)  Port development and infrastructure [security,
 transportation, or facility] projects eligible for funding under
 this chapter include:
 (1)  construction or improvement of transportation
 facilities within the jurisdiction of a maritime port;
 (2)  the dredging or deepening of channels, turning
 basins, or harbors;
 (3)  the construction or improvement of wharves, docks,
 structures, jetties, piers, storage facilities, cruise terminals,
 or [any] facilities necessary or useful, as determined by the
 committee, in connection with maritime port transportation or
 economic development;
 (4)  the construction or improvement of facilities
 necessary or useful in providing maritime port security;
 (5)  the acquisition of container cranes or other
 mechanized equipment used in the movement of cargo or passengers in
 [international] commerce and trade;
 (6)  the acquisition of land to be used for maritime
 port purposes;
 (7)  the acquisition, improvement, enlargement, or
 extension of existing maritime port facilities; and
 (8)  environmental protection projects that:
 (A)  are required as a condition of a state,
 federal, or local environmental permit or other form of approval;
 (B)  are necessary for the acquisition of spoil
 disposal sites and improvements to existing and future spoil sites;
 or
 (C)  result from the undertaking of eligible
 projects.
 (e)  The commission may use money from the Texas Mobility
 Fund to provide funding for a port connectivity [access
 improvement] project.
 (f)  An applicant eligible for funding under this section may
 not receive more than 20 percent of the total amount of money
 appropriated to the department in a fiscal biennium to fund the
 applicant's eligible projects under this section.
 SECTION 4.  Section 55.005, Transportation Code, as added by
 Section 1, Chapter 1268 (S.B. 1282), Acts of the 77th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2001, is reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 55.005.  PORT ACCESS ACCOUNT FUND.  (a)  The port access
 account fund is an account in the general revenue fund.
 (b)  The following money shall be credited to the fund:
 (1)  money received from gifts, grants, and donations;
 [and]
 (2)  interest earned on deposits and investments of the
 fund;
 (3)  money appropriated to the fund by the legislature;
 and
 (4)  money received from the federal government.
 (c)  Money in the fund may be appropriated only to the
 department to perform the department's powers and duties concerning
 maritime port transportation and economic development under this
 chapter and to pay the department's expenses incurred under this
 chapter, as approved by the committee.
 (c-1)  Money appropriated by the legislature under
 Subsection (b)(3) may only be used to fund eligible port
 development and infrastructure projects under Section 55.002.
 (d)  The financial transactions of the fund are subject to
 audit by the state auditor.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1499 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 16, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1499 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 131,
 Nays 9, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor