Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1565 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/24/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hughes, Springer S.B. No. 1565
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 April 24, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute from Committee on Education by the following vote:
 Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 24, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1565 By:  Springer


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the establishment of policy frameworks for
 research security at public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.956 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.956.  POLICY FRAMEWORK FOR RESEARCH SECURITY. (a)
 In this section, "governing board," "institution of higher
 education," and "university system" have the meanings assigned by
 Section 61.003.
 (b)  The governing board of each institution of higher
 education shall establish a policy framework that promotes secure
 academic research at the institution while mitigating the risk of
 foreign espionage and interference. The governing board of a
 university system must establish a separate policy framework for
 each institution of higher education under the governing board's
 management and control.
 (c)  The policy framework must address:
 (1)  achieving the highest level of compliance with
 applicable ethical, legal, regulatory, contractual, and system
 standards and requirements for securing and protecting the
 institution's research portfolios;
 (2)  promoting within the institution an
 organizational culture of compliance with federal requirements to
 ensure the institution maintains eligibility for federal funding;
 and
 (3)  designating a person to serve as a research
 security officer responsible for maintaining classified
 information, maintaining controlled unclassified information,
 conducting foreign influence reporting, and addressing other
 issues at the institution associated with the goals of the policy
 framework.
 (d)  For purposes of designating a person to serve as a
 research security officer under Subsection (c)(3), the governing
 board of a university system may designate a person to serve in an
 institutional or system-wide capacity.
 (e)  A person designated to serve as a research security
 officer under Subsection (c)(3) shall attend the annual academic
 security and counter exploitation program seminar offered by Texas
 A&M University.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the governing board of each public institution of
 higher education shall establish the policy framework for research
 security required under Section 51.956, Education Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *