Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1575 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

                    By: Middleton S.B. No. 1575
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 30, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 2; March 30, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a member of the State Board of
 Education to request an attorney general opinion.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 402.042(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  An opinion may be requested by:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the head of a department of state government;
 (3)  a head or board of a penal institution;
 (4)  a head or board of an eleemosynary institution;
 (5)  the head of a state board;
 (6)  a regent or trustee of a state educational
 institution;
 (7)  a committee of a house of the legislature;
 (8)  a county auditor authorized by law; [or]
 (9)  the chairman of the governing board of a river
 authority; or
 (10)  a member of the State Board of Education.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *