Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1603 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1603


 AN ACT
 relating to the decision of a court of appeals not to accept certain
 interlocutory appeals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.014, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subsections (g) and (h) to read as
 follows:
 (g)  If a court of appeals does not accept an appeal under
 Subsection (f), the court shall state in its decision the specific
 reason for finding that the appeal is not warranted under
 Subsection (d).
 (h)  The supreme court may review a decision by a court of
 appeals not to accept an appeal under Subsection (f) de novo.  If
 the supreme court concludes that the requirements to permit an
 appeal under Subsection (d) are satisfied, the court may direct the
 court of appeals to accept the appeal.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for interlocutory appeal filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1603 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1603 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 4, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor