Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1603 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2023

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1603
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 27, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 27, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the decision of a court of appeals not to accept certain
 interlocutory appeals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.014, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subsections (g) and (h) to read as
 follows:
 (g)  If a court of appeals does not accept an appeal under
 Subsection (f), the court shall state in its decision the specific
 reason for finding that the appeal is not warranted under
 Subsection (d).
 (h)  The supreme court may review a decision by a court of
 appeals not to accept an appeal under Subsection (f) under an abuse
 of discretion standard.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for interlocutory appeal filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *