Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB163 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2023

                    By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 163
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 6, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; April 6, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to parental approval for a student's participation in
 human sexuality instruction in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.004(i-3), Education Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *