Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1661 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2023

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1661
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 6, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 6, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1661 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a ballot scan system used in a central counting station.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 127.1301(b), Election Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  An authority operating a central counting station under
 this chapter may only [not] purchase or use a [centrally counted
 optical] ballot scan system if the system is only capable of using
 [that uses] a data transfer media device that:
 (1)  [storage disc on which information,] once a cast
 vote record is written, is incapable [capable] of being modified
 without automatic:
 (A)  detection of the modification; and
 (B)  rejection of the cast vote record; and
 (2)  does not allow for the process under Subdivision
 (1) to be overridden or circumvented.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *