Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1803 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Springer, West S.B. No. 1803
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2023; March 20, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the effectiveness of state-funded homelessness
 programs at helping beneficiaries advance toward self-sufficiency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.084 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.084.  STATEWIDE HOMELESSNESS SERVICES AUDIT. (a)
 In 2024 and every second year after that year, the state auditor
 shall conduct an effectiveness and efficiency audit of all services
 for the homeless provided by agencies of this state.
 (b)  The cost of the audit shall be paid for using existing
 resources allocated for the purpose of auditing the agencies
 identified in Subsection (g).
 (c)  Not later than March 1 of the year in which an audit is
 required under this section, the state auditor shall engage an
 external auditor to conduct the audit.
 (d)  The state auditor shall oversee the external auditor and
 ensure that the audit is conducted in accordance with the
 requirements of this section.
 (e)  The external auditor shall be independent and not
 subject to direction from any state agency subject to evaluation by
 the auditor for purposes of this section.
 (f)  The audit shall:
 (1)  examine all state resources, including but not
 limited to financial resources, manpower, and infrastructure used
 in providing services to the homeless;
 (2)  assess the effectiveness of state agencies,
 programs, and community service providers receiving state funds at
 helping the homeless achieve self-sufficiency, including the
 following outcomes:
 (A)  the percentage of beneficiaries who secure
 and maintain housing for which they are the primary payer;
 (B)  the percentage of beneficiaries whose
 children regularly attend school or other educational programs;
 (C)  the percentage of beneficiaries who
 participate in at least 20 hours per week of paid public or private
 sector work, including paid apprenticeships;
 (D)  the percentage of beneficiaries engaged in
 occupational or vocational training programs;
 (E)  the percentage of beneficiaries who move from
 subsidized income to earned income as a primary source of earnings;
 (F)  the percentage of beneficiaries who have
 regular visits with a primary care physician;
 (G)  the percentage of beneficiaries with mental
 health needs who engage in regular mental health care services;
 (H)  the percentage of beneficiaries with
 addiction or substance use disorder who engage in regular treatment
 services; and
 (I)  the percentage of beneficiaries without
 involvement with the criminal justice system;
 (3)  rate each agency, program, and community service
 provider reviewed as "unsatisfactory," "satisfactory," or
 "exemplary" based on their effectiveness at achieving the outcomes
 under Subsection (f)(2); and
 (4)  make recommendations for:
 (A)  eliminating poorly performing programs;
 (B)  ending contractual or funding relationships
 with poorly performing community service providers;
 (C)  consolidating duplicative or overlapping
 services and functions; and
 (D)  reallocating state resources to ensure that
 the outcomes under Subsection (f)(2) are achieved in the most
 effective and economical manner.
 (g)  The following agencies must be included in the audit:
 (1)  Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs;
 (2)  Texas Health and Human Services Commission;
 (3)  Texas Department of Family and Protective
 Services;
 (4)  Texas Education Agency;
 (5)  Texas Workforce Commission;
 (6)  Texas Veterans Commission; and
 (7)  Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 (h)  The state auditor may select other agencies or programs
 in addition to those listed in Subsection (g) for inclusion in the
 audit.
 (i)  The external auditor must complete the audit not later
 than the 90th day after the date the auditor is engaged and present
 its results and recommendations to the state auditor and the heads
 of the agencies subject to the audit.
 (j)  Not later than November 1 of the calendar year in which
 an audit is completed, the state auditor shall prepare and submit a
 report of the audit and recommendations for improvement to the
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the
 lieutenant governor, and the Legislative Budget Board.
 (k)  The full audit and state auditor's report must be
 published to the state auditor's Internet website.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *