Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1820 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/05/2023

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 1820
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2023; March 20, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 5, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 5, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1820 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prohibited play and facilitation of play of a
 lottery game by telephone or through the Internet.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 466.015, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-2) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The commission shall adopt rules to the extent they are
 not inconsistent with Chapters 551 and 552 governing the:
 (1)  security for the lottery and the commission,
 including the development of an internal security plan;
 (2)  apportionment of the total revenues from the sale
 of tickets and from all other sources in the amounts provided by
 this chapter;
 (3)  enforcement of prohibitions on the sale of tickets
 to or by an individual younger than 18 years of age; and
 (4)  enforcement of prohibitions on a person playing or
 facilitating the playing of a lottery game by telephone or through
 the Internet.
 (b-2)  For purposes of this section, a person:
 (1)  plays a lottery game by telephone or through the
 Internet if the person, by telephone or through an Internet
 application or mobile Internet application:
 (A)  orders or purchases a ticket for the game; or
 (B)  arranges for another person to purchase a
 ticket on behalf of the person playing the game; and
 (2)  facilitates the playing of a lottery game by
 telephone or through the Internet if the person, by telephone or
 through an Internet application or mobile Internet application:
 (A)  accepts orders for or sells a ticket for the
 game; or
 (B)  arranges to purchase or for another person to
 purchase a ticket on behalf of the person playing the game.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2024, the Texas Lottery
 Commission shall adopt or amend rules as necessary to implement the
 changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *