Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1831 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/31/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1831
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2023; March 20, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; March 31, 2023,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 17, Nays 0; March 31, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1831 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchase of certain goods and services by the
 Employees Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 815.103, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  Notwithstanding any other law, the retirement system
 has exclusive authority over all aspects of the purchase of goods
 and services, if the purchase is:
 (1)  made using money other than money appropriated
 from the general revenue fund; and
 (2)  related to the operation of home office facilities
 used in administering the system, including a purchase related to
 the administration of tenant leases in the facilities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *