Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1850 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/02/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Flores S.B. No. 1850
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2023; March 20, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; May 2, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 2, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the presiding officer of the State Board of Veterinary
 Medical Examiners.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 801.055(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The governor shall designate a veterinarian member of
 the board as the presiding officer of the board to serve in that
 capacity at the pleasure of the governor.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the appointment of the presiding officer of the State Board of
 Veterinary Medical Examiners on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *