Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB186 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 186
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prohibited discharge of a patient to certain
 unlicensed or unpermitted group-centered facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 256, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 256. SAFE PATIENT HANDLING, [AND] MOVEMENT, AND DISCHARGE
 PRACTICES
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 256, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 256.003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 256.003.  PROHIBITED DISCHARGE OF PATIENTS TO CERTAIN
 GROUP-CENTERED FACILITIES. (a) Subject to Subsection (b), a
 hospital or other health facility may discharge or otherwise
 release a patient to the care of a group home, boarding home
 facility, or similar group-centered facility only if the person who
 operates the group-centered facility holds a license or permit
 issued in accordance with applicable state law.
 (b)  A hospital or other health facility may discharge or
 otherwise release a patient to the care of a group home, boarding
 home facility, or similar group-centered facility operated by a
 person who does not hold a license or permit issued in accordance
 with applicable state law only if:
 (1)  no group-centered facility is operated in the
 county in which the patient is discharged by a person who holds the
 applicable license or permit; or
 (2)  the patient voluntarily elects to reside in the
 group-centered facility of the unlicensed or unpermitted person.
 (c)  A hospital or other health facility is not liable for
 damages to a patient resulting from the patient's discharge or
 release to a group home, boarding home facility, or similar
 group-centered facility under Subsection (b).
 (d)  A local health authority may not issue an order
 authorizing a hospital or health facility to discharge or release a
 patient to a group-centered facility in a manner that conflicts
 with this section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 256.003(c), Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a cause of action that accrues on
 or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *