Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1864 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2023

                    By: Middleton S.B. No. 1864
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2023; March 20, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 24, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 24, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain placements for children in the conservatorship
 of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.020.  PLACEMENT OF CHILDREN IN CONSERVATORSHIP OF
 DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES. (a)  In this section,
 "child" means a person who:
 (1)  is younger than 22 years of age and for whom the
 department has been appointed managing conservator of the child
 before the child's 18th birthday; or
 (2)  is the responsibility of an agency with which the
 department has entered into an agreement to provide care and
 supervision of the child.
 (b)  In making a placement decision for a child, the
 department shall give preference to persons in the following order:
 (1)  a person related to the child by blood, marriage,
 or adoption;
 (2)  a person with whom the child has a long-standing
 and significant relationship;
 (3)  a foster home; and
 (4)  a general residential operation.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *