Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB189 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 189


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a criminal offense concerning the
 failure of certain persons to report mistreatment of residents of
 group homes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 260, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 260.0091 to read as follows:
 Sec. 260.0091.  REQUIRED REPORT BY LESSOR OF ABUSE, NEGLECT,
 OR EXPLOITATION; CRIMINAL PENALTY. (a)  A person commits an offense
 if the person:
 (1)  owns a building that the person leases to another
 person who operates a boarding home facility in the building;
 (2)  has actual knowledge that a resident of the
 boarding home facility is being or has been abused, neglected, or
 exploited; and
 (3)  fails to report the abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation to the Department of Family and Protective Services
 for investigation by that agency.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  Section 260.010(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Not later than September 30 of each year following the
 establishment of a county or municipal permitting requirement under
 this chapter, each county or municipality that requires a person to
 obtain a boarding home facility permit under Section 260.004 shall
 submit to the commission a report.  The report must include:
 (1)  the total number of:
 (A)  boarding home facilities permitted during
 the preceding state fiscal year;
 (B)  boarding home facility applications denied
 permitting, including a summary of cause for denial; and
 (C)  boarding home facility permits active on
 August 31 of the preceding state fiscal year;
 (2)  the total number of residents reported housed in
 each boarding home facility reported;
 (3)  the total number of inspections conducted at each
 boarding home facility by the county or municipality that requires
 the permit; [and]
 (4)  the total number of permits revoked or suspended
 as a result of an inspection described by Subdivision (3) and a
 summary of the outcome for the residents displaced by revocation or
 suspension of a permit; and
 (5)  the total number of incidents occurring at each
 boarding home facility that required the intervention of a peace
 officer as defined by Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 38, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 38.172 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.172.  FAILURE TO REPORT ASSAULT, NEGLECT, OR
 OMISSION OF CARE IN CERTAIN GROUP HOMES. (a) In this section,
 "group home" means an establishment that:
 (1)  provides, in one or more buildings, lodging to
 three or more residents who are unrelated by blood or marriage to
 the owner of the establishment; and
 (2)  provides those residents with community meals,
 light housework, meal preparation, transportation, grocery
 shopping, money management, laundry services, or assistance with
 self-administration of medication but does not provide personal
 care services as defined by Section 247.002, Health and Safety
 Code.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person:
 (1)  has actual knowledge that a resident of a group
 home has suffered bodily injury due to assault, neglect, or an
 omission in care; and
 (2)  fails to report that fact to law enforcement or the
 Department of Family and Protective Services.
 (c)  It is an exception to the application of this section
 that:
 (1)  the actor is a person who holds a license issued
 under Chapter 142, 242, 246, 247, or 252, Health and Safety Code, or
 who is exempt from licensing under Section 142.003(a)(19),
 242.003(3), or 247.004(4), Health and Safety Code; or
 (2)  the injury occurs in:
 (A)  an establishment or facility exempt from
 licensing under Section 142.003(a)(19), 242.003(3), or 247.004(4),
 Health and Safety Code;
 (B)  a hotel as defined by Section 156.001, Tax
 Code;
 (C)  a retirement community;
 (D)  a monastery or convent;
 (E)  a child-care facility as defined by Section
 42.002, Human Resources Code;
 (F)  a family violence shelter center as defined
 by Section 51.002, Human Resources Code; or
 (G)  a sorority or fraternity house or other
 dormitory associated with an institution of higher education.
 (d)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 (e)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor may be
 prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 189 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 189 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 111,
 Nays 35, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor