Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1910 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1910
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2023; March 20, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 30, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 2; March 30, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to certain election records under the public
 information law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.103, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  This section does not except from the requirements of
 Section 552.021 information related to a general, primary, or
 special election, as those terms are defined by Section 1.005,
 Election Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *