Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1929 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2023

                    S.B. No. 1929


 AN ACT
 relating to the registration of virtual currency mining facilities
 in the ERCOT power region that demand a large load of interruptible
 power.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.360 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.360.  LARGE FLEXIBLE LOAD REGISTRATION.  (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Virtual currency" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 12.001, Business & Commerce Code.
 (2)  "Virtual currency mining facility" means a
 facility that uses electronic equipment to add virtual currency
 transactions to a distributed ledger.
 (b)  The commission by rule shall require a person operating
 a virtual currency mining facility who enters into an agreement for
 retail electric service in the ERCOT power region to register the
 facility receiving service as a large flexible load under this
 section if:
 (1)  the facility requires a total load of more than 75
 megawatts; and
 (2)  the facility load is interruptible.
 (c)  The rules must require a person described by Subsection
 (b) to:
 (1)  register the large flexible load with the
 commission not later than one business day after the date the
 agreement begins; and
 (2)  provide the commission with:
 (A)  the location of the facility; and
 (B)  the anticipated demand from the facility for
 the five-year period beginning on the date of the registration.
 (d)  The commission by rule shall:
 (1)  adopt criteria for determining whether a load is
 interruptible for the purposes of this section based on whether it
 is possible for the facility operator to choose to interrupt the
 load; and
 (2)  establish a method to ensure compliance with this
 section.
 (e)  The commission may share with an independent
 organization certified under Section 39.151 registration
 information received under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1929 passed the Senate on
 April 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1929 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 5, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor