Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1987 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2023

                    By: Sparks S.B. No. 1987
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2023; March 21, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 April 24, 2023, reported favorably from Committee on Education by
 the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 24, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the accreditation of certain postsecondary educational
 institutions in this state or of certain programs offered by those
 institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 61.003(13) and (15), Education Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (13)  "Recognized accrediting agency" means [the
 Southern Association of Colleges and Schools and] any [other]
 association or organization so designated by the board.
 (15)  "Private or independent institution of higher
 education" includes only a private or independent college or
 university that is:
 (A)  organized under the Texas Non-Profit
 Corporation Act (Article 1396-1.01 et seq., Vernon's Texas Civil
 Statutes);
 (B)  exempt from taxation under Article VIII,
 Section 2, of the Texas Constitution and Section 501(c)(3) of the
 Internal Revenue Code of 1986 (26 U.S.C. Section 501); and
 (C)  accredited by:
 (i)  any accreditor recognized by the United
 States Department of Education [Commission on Colleges of the
 Southern Association of Colleges and Schools];
 (ii)  the Liaison Committee on Medical
 Education; or
 (iii)  the American Bar Association.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.0515(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  To earn a baccalaureate degree, a student may not be
 required by a general academic teaching institution to complete
 more than the minimum number of semester credit hours required for
 the degree by the institution's recognized accrediting agency
 [Southern Association of Colleges and Schools or its successor]
 unless the institution determines that there is a compelling
 academic reason for requiring completion of additional semester
 credit hours for the degree.
 SECTION 3.  Section 61.05151(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  To earn an associate degree, a student may not be
 required by an institution of higher education to complete more
 than the minimum number of semester credit hours required for the
 degree by the institution's recognized accrediting agency
 [Southern Association of Colleges and Schools or its successor]
 unless the institution determines that there is a compelling
 academic reason for requiring completion of additional semester
 credit hours for the degree.
 SECTION 4.  Section 61.8235(f), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (f)  A student enrolled in a board-established program of
 study who transfers from a public junior college, public state
 college, or public technical institute to another public junior
 college, public state college, or public technical institute that
 offers a similar program, regardless of whether the institution has
 adopted the board-established program of study, shall receive
 academic credit from the institution to which the student
 transferred for each of the courses that the student has
 successfully completed in the program of study curriculum. Unless
 otherwise required by the institution's recognized accrediting
 agency [Commission on Colleges of the Southern Association of
 Colleges and Schools], the student may complete the program of
 study at the institution to which the student transferred by
 completing only the remaining number of semester credit hours the
 student would need to complete the program of study at the
 institution from which the student transferred.
 SECTION 5.  Section 107.151(c), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter,
 the university may operate as a general academic teaching
 institution only after the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board certifies that the university is accredited by a recognized
 accrediting agency, as defined by Section 61.003, [the Southern
 Association of Colleges and Schools Commission on Colleges] and has
 been approved by the coordinating board to offer one or more degree
 programs. Until the coordinating board certifies that the
 conditions of this subsection have been met, the board of regents
 may operate a branch campus of Texas Woman's University in the city
 of Dallas.
 SECTION 6.  Section 107.201(c), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter,
 the university may operate as a general academic teaching
 institution only after the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board certifies that the university is accredited by a recognized
 accrediting agency, as defined by Section 61.003, [the Southern
 Association of Colleges and Schools Commission on Colleges] and has
 been approved by the coordinating board to offer one or more degree
 programs. Until the coordinating board certifies that the
 conditions of this subsection have been met, the board of regents
 may operate a branch campus of Texas Woman's University in the city
 of Houston.
 SECTION 7.  Section 130.301, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows:
 (3)  "Recognized accrediting agency" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 SECTION 8.  Section 130.305, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 130.305.  ACCREDITATION. A public junior college
 offering a baccalaureate degree program under this subchapter must
 meet all applicable accreditation requirements of a recognized
 accrediting agency [the Commission on Colleges of the Southern
 Association of Colleges and Schools].
 SECTION 9.  Section 130.307(c), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Before a public junior college may be authorized to
 offer a baccalaureate degree program under this subchapter, the
 public junior college must submit a report to the coordinating
 board that includes:
 (1)  a long-term financial plan for receiving
 accreditation from a recognized accrediting agency [the Commission
 on Colleges of the Southern Association of Colleges and Schools];
 (2)  a long-term plan for faculty recruitment that:
 (A)  indicates the ability to pay the increased
 salaries of doctoral faculty;
 (B)  identifies recruitment strategies for new
 faculty; and
 (C)  ensures the program would not draw faculty
 employed by a neighboring institution offering a similar program;
 (3)  detailed information on the manner of program and
 course delivery; and
 (4)  detailed information regarding existing
 articulation agreements and dual enrollment agreements indicating:
 (A)  that at least three articulation agreements
 have been established with general academic teaching institutions
 or medical and dental units, or the reasons why no articulation
 agreements have been established; and
 (B)  that, with the agreement of the applicable
 general academic teaching institution or medical and dental unit,
 established articulation agreements are at capacity.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *