Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1990 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/06/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1990
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2023; March 21, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 6, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 6, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1990 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for selecting a provider of professional
 services by certain water districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49.057(d), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The [In selecting attorneys, engineers, auditors,
 financial advisors, or other professional consultants, the]
 district shall follow the procedures provided in Subchapter A,
 Chapter 2254, Government Code (Professional Services Procurement
 Act), when selecting a provider of professional services.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *