Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1999 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1999
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2023; March 21, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; April 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the calculation of the unused increment rate of a taxing
 unit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 26.013(a), Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivisions (1-a) and (1-b) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Foregone revenue amount" means the greater of:
 (A)  zero; or
 (B)  the amount expressed in dollars calculated
 according to the following formula:
 FOREGONE REVENUE AMOUNT = (VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE - ACTUAL
 TAX RATE) x PRECEDING TOTAL VALUE
 (1-b)  "Preceding total value" means a taxing unit's
 current total value in the applicable preceding tax year.
 SECTION 2.  Section 26.013(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  In this chapter, "unused increment rate" means the
 greater of:
 (1)  zero; or
 (2)  the rate expressed in dollars per $100 of taxable
 value calculated according to the following formula:
 UNUSED INCREMENT RATE = (YEAR 1 FOREGONE REVENUE AMOUNT +
 YEAR 2 FOREGONE REVENUE AMOUNT + YEAR 3 FOREGONE REVENUE AMOUNT) /
 CURRENT TOTAL VALUE [VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE - YEAR 1 ACTUAL TAX
 RATE) + (YEAR 2 VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE - YEAR 2 ACTUAL TAX RATE) +
 (YEAR 3 VOTER-APPROVAL TAX RATE - YEAR 3 ACTUAL TAX RATE)]
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2024.
 * * * * *