Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2052 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 2052
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2023; March 21, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; April 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to permit fees for groundwater wells imposed by the
 Southeast Texas Groundwater Conservation District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8868.153, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8868.153.  PERMIT FEES.  (a)  The district by rule may
 impose a reasonable fee on each well that is not exempt from
 regulation by the district and for which a permit is issued by the
 district.
 (b)  The fee must be based on the amount of water to be
 withdrawn from the well.
 (c)  The fee may not exceed seven cents [one cent] per
 thousand gallons of groundwater withdrawn for any purpose.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *