Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2064 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2023

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 2064
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2023; March 21, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 24, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 24, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2064 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissemination of patient information through a
 telemedicine, telehealth, or teledentistry service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 111, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Section 111.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 111.010.  RESTRICTION ON SALE OR SHARING OF PATIENT
 INFORMATION. (a) In this section, "social media platform" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 120.001, Business & Commerce Code.
 (b)  A physician, health professional, or dentist may not
 provide a telemedicine medical service, telehealth service, or
 teledentistry dental service, as applicable, through an entity that
 provides telecommunications or information technology to enable
 the service if the entity engages in the sale of or otherwise shares
 patient information with a social media platform.
 (c)  A physician, health professional, or dentist who
 knowingly violates this section is subject to disciplinary action
 by the applicable licensing entity. A licensing entity may adopt
 rules necessary to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *