Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2233 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: LaMantia, Hinojosa S.B. No. 2233
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 22, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to automatic renewal of certain policies issued by the
 Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2210.2031(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The association shall establish a process for automatic
 renewal of a residential property policy in accordance with this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *