Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2294 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 2294
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 22, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 April 11, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute from Committee on Education by the following vote:
 Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2294 By:  Springer


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas First Early High School Completion Program
 and the Texas First Scholarship Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.0253(a)(2), Education Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Eligible institution" means an institution of
 higher education [that is designated as a research university or
 emerging research university under the coordinating board's
 accountability system].
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.0253(e), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school
 shall allow a student to graduate and receive [may issue] a high
 school diploma [to a student] under the program if, using the
 standards established under Subsection (c), the student
 demonstrates mastery of and early readiness for college in each of
 the subject areas described by that subsection and in a language
 other than English, notwithstanding any other local or state
 requirements.
 SECTION 3.  Section 56.221(2), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (2)  "Eligible institution" means an institution of
 higher education, as that term is defined by Section 61.003[, that
 is designated as a research university or emerging research
 university under the coordinating board's accountability system].
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *