Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2310 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/02/2023

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 2, 2023       TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SB2310 by Hinojosa (Relating to longevity pay for certain prosecutors.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2310, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($766,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025.  General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2024($370,000)2025($396,000)2026($570,000)2027($595,000)2028($620,000)All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12024($370,000)2025($396,000)2026($570,000)2027($595,000)2028($620,000) Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend the Government code to provide longevity pay to district attorneys, criminal district attorneys, prosecutors and the state prosecuting attorney equal to a judge with 12 years of service.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 2, 2023

 

 

  TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SB2310 by Hinojosa (Relating to longevity pay for certain prosecutors.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB2310 by Hinojosa (Relating to longevity pay for certain prosecutors.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance

 Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 SB2310 by Hinojosa (Relating to longevity pay for certain prosecutors.), As Introduced 

 SB2310 by Hinojosa (Relating to longevity pay for certain prosecutors.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2310, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($766,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2310, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($766,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. 



General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2024 ($370,000)
2025 ($396,000)
2026 ($570,000)
2027 ($595,000)
2028 ($620,000)

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2024 ($370,000)
2025 ($396,000)
2026 ($570,000)
2027 ($595,000)
2028 ($620,000)

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Government code to provide longevity pay to district attorneys, criminal district attorneys, prosecutors and the state prosecuting attorney equal to a judge with 12 years of service.

 Methodology

State judicial and prosecutorial salary  compensation and supplements is traditionally met through a mix of General Revenue and Judicial Fund No. 573 funding, however for the past several fiscal years Judicial Fund No. 573 revenues have not been sufficient to meet all judicial and prosecutorial salary obligations. Due to this, General Revenue funding has been used to meet the remaining obligations. Therefore, this estimate assumes General Revenue funding would be needed to cover the full state obligations for these provisions.Based on information provided by the Office of Court Administration, it is assumed that up to 48 prosecutors could be eligible on September 1, 2024 and up to 49 will be eligible on September 1, 2025. Costs in the table above reflect amounts each fiscal year that are estimated to be necessary to provide longevity pay to district attorneys, criminal district attorneys, prosecutors and the state prosecuting attorney equal to a judge with 12 years of service based on the analysis of the Comptroller of Public Accounts.

State judicial and prosecutorial salary  compensation and supplements is traditionally met through a mix of General Revenue and Judicial Fund No. 573 funding, however for the past several fiscal years Judicial Fund No. 573 revenues have not been sufficient to meet all judicial and prosecutorial salary obligations. Due to this, General Revenue funding has been used to meet the remaining obligations. Therefore, this estimate assumes General Revenue funding would be needed to cover the full state obligations for these provisions.



 Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 327 Employees Retirement System

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 327 Employees Retirement System

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, KK, MW, JPa

JMc, KK, MW, JPa