Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2350 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 2350
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 23, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the voter-approval tax rate used to calculate the
 unused increment rate of a taxing unit for ad valorem tax purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 26.013(a)(2), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (2)  "Voter-approval tax rate" means a taxing unit's
 voter-approval tax rate in the applicable preceding tax year, as
 adopted by the taxing unit during the applicable preceding tax
 year, less the unused increment rate for that preceding tax year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *