Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2376 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 2376
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 23, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of Support Adoption specialty license
 plates and to the Support Adoption account and certain voluntary
 contributions to that account.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 402.036, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 402.036.  SUPPORT ADOPTION [CHOOSE LIFE] ACCOUNT.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 402.036(a), (b), (b-1), (e), (f), and
 (g), Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Support Adoption [Choose Life] account is a separate
 account in the general revenue fund.  The account is composed of:
 (1)  money deposited to the credit of the account under
 Sections [Section] 504.662 and 521.015, Transportation Code; and
 (2)  gifts, grants, donations, and legislative
 appropriations.
 (b)  The attorney general administers the Support Adoption
 [Choose Life] account. The attorney general may spend money
 credited to the account only to:
 (1)  make grants to an eligible organization; and
 (2)  defray the cost of administering the account,
 including the cost of advertising authorized by Subsection (b-1).
 (b-1)  The attorney general may advertise that fees paid for
 the issuance of a license plate in accordance with Section 504.662,
 Transportation Code, may be used to fund the grants described by
 Subsection (b)(1), provided that the money spent under this
 subsection does not exceed two percent of the amount of gross
 receipts deposited to the Support Adoption [Choose Life] account
 during the preceding state fiscal year.
 (e)  The attorney general by rule shall establish:
 (1)  guidelines for the expenditure of money credited
 to the Support Adoption [Choose Life] account; and
 (2)  reporting and other mechanisms necessary to ensure
 that the money is spent in accordance with this section.
 (f)  Money received by an eligible organization under this
 section may be spent only to provide for the material needs of
 pregnant women who are considering placing their children for
 adoption, including the provision of clothing, housing, prenatal
 care, food, utilities, and transportation, to provide for the needs
 of children [infants] who are awaiting placement with adoptive
 parents, to provide training and advertising relating to adoption,
 and to provide pregnancy testing or pre-adoption or postadoption
 counseling, but may not be used to pay an administrative, legal, or
 capital expense.
 (g)  In this section, "eligible organization" means an
 organization in this state that:
 (1)  is exempt from federal income taxation under
 Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being listed as an
 exempt charitable organization under Section 501(c)(3) of that
 code;
 (2)  provides counseling and material assistance to
 pregnant women who are considering placing their children for
 adoption or to prospective adoptive parents;
 (3)  does not charge for services provided, except for
 adoption-related costs or fees;
 (4)  does not provide abortions or abortion-related
 services or make referrals to abortion providers;
 (5)  is not affiliated with an organization that
 provides abortions or abortion-related services or makes referrals
 to abortion providers; and
 (6)  does not contract with an organization that
 provides abortions or abortion-related services or makes referrals
 to abortion providers.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 402.037, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 402.037.  SUPPORT ADOPTION [CHOOSE LIFE] ADVISORY
 COMMITTEE.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 402.037(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The attorney general shall appoint a seven-member
 Support Adoption [Choose Life] advisory committee.
 (b)  The committee shall:
 (1)  meet at least twice a year or as called by the
 attorney general;
 (2)  assist the attorney general in developing rules
 under Section 402.036(e); and
 (3)  review and make recommendations to the attorney
 general on applications submitted to the attorney general for
 grants funded with money credited to the Support Adoption [Choose
 Life] account.
 SECTION 5.  Section 504.662, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.662.  SUPPORT ADOPTION [CHOOSE LIFE] LICENSE
 PLATES.  (a)  The department shall issue specially designed
 license plates that include the words "Support Adoption [Choose
 Life]."  The department shall design the license plates in
 consultation with the attorney general.
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the department shall deposit the remainder of the fee for
 issuance of license plates under this section in the state treasury
 to the credit of the Support Adoption [Choose Life] account
 established by Section 402.036, Government Code.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter A, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.015.  VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION TO SUPPORT
 ADOPTION.  (a)  When a person applies for an original or renewal
 driver's license or personal identification certificate under this
 chapter, the person may contribute any amount to the Support
 Adoption account established by Section 402.036, Government Code,
 to support adoption.
 (b)  The department shall:
 (1)  include space on the first page of each
 application for an original or renewal driver's license or personal
 identification certificate that allows a person applying for an
 original or renewal driver's license or personal identification
 certificate to indicate the amount that the person is voluntarily
 contributing to the account; and
 (2)  provide an opportunity for the person to
 contribute to the account during the application process for an
 original or renewal driver's license or personal identification
 certificate on the department's Internet website.
 (c)  The department shall send any contribution made under
 this section to the comptroller for deposit to the credit of the
 Support Adoption account established by Section 402.036,
 Government Code, not later than the 14th day of each month. Before
 sending the money to the comptroller, the department may deduct
 money equal to the amount of reasonable expenses for administering
 this section.
 SECTION 7.  Not later than December 31, 2023, the Department
 of Public Safety shall provide an opportunity for a person who
 applies for an original or renewal driver's license or personal
 identification certificate to make a voluntary contribution to
 support adoption, as required by Section 521.015, Transportation
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *