Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2379 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 2379
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 23, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; April 17, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2379 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to aquifer storage and recovery projects that transect a
 portion of the Edwards Aquifer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 27.051(i), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (i)  For purposes of this subsection, "Edwards Aquifer" has
 the meaning assigned by Section 26.046(a).  Except as otherwise
 provided by this subsection, the commission may not authorize by
 rule or permit an injection well that transects or terminates in the
 Edwards Aquifer.  The commission by rule or permit may authorize:
 (1)  injection of groundwater withdrawn from the
 Edwards Aquifer;
 (2)  injections of storm water, flood water, or
 groundwater through improved sinkholes or caves located in karst
 topographic areas; [or]
 (3)  injections of water made in accordance with
 Section 1.44(e)(3), Chapter 626, Acts of the 73rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1993; or
 (4)  an aquifer storage and recovery project that
 includes an ASR injection well, as defined under Section 27.151,
 that transects the Edwards Aquifer in the area of Williamson County
 east of Interstate Highway 35 for the injection of water into a
 geologic formation that underlies the Edwards Aquifer.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than March 1, 2024, the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality shall adopt rules to implement
 Section 27.051(i), Water Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *