Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2422 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/08/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 2422
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 23, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 May 8, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute from Committee on Education by the following vote:
 Yeas 12, Nays 0; May 8, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2422 By:  King


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain records containing
 applicant or student information that are held by the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 61.031, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.031.  PUBLIC [INTEREST] INFORMATION AND COMPLAINTS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.031, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other provision of law, information
 that relates to a current, former, or prospective applicant or
 student of an educational institution and that is obtained,
 received, or held by the board for the purpose of providing
 assistance with access to postsecondary education shall be
 considered confidential and excepted from disclosure under Chapter
 552, Government Code, and may only be released in conformity with
 the Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 (20 U.S.C.
 Section 1232g).  The board may withhold information prohibited from
 being disclosed under this subsection without requesting a decision
 from the attorney general under Subchapter G, Chapter 552,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *