Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2428 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/01/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 2428
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 23, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 1, 2023,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0; May 1, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2428 By:  Parker


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the removal of a public school student from the
 classroom for the possession or use of an e-cigarette.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.006, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A student shall be removed from class and placed in a
 disciplinary alternative education program as provided by Section
 37.008 if the student:
 (1)  engages in conduct involving a public school that
 contains the elements of the offense of false alarm or report under
 Section 42.06, Penal Code, or terroristic threat under Section
 22.07, Penal Code; or
 (2)  subject to Subsections (a-1) and (a-2), commits
 the following on or within 300 feet of school property, as measured
 from any point on the school's real property boundary line, or while
 attending a school-sponsored or school-related activity on or off
 of school property:
 (A)  engages in conduct punishable as a felony;
 (B)  engages in conduct that contains the elements
 of the offense of assault under Section 22.01(a)(1), Penal Code;
 (C)  sells, gives, or delivers to another person
 or possesses or uses or is under the influence of:
 (i)  marihuana or a controlled substance, as
 defined by Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code, or by 21 U.S.C.
 Section 801 et seq.; or
 (ii)  a dangerous drug, as defined by
 Chapter 483, Health and Safety Code;
 (D)  sells, gives, or delivers to another person
 an alcoholic beverage, as defined by Section 1.04, Alcoholic
 Beverage Code, commits a serious act or offense while under the
 influence of alcohol, or possesses, uses, or is under the influence
 of an alcoholic beverage;
 (E)  engages in conduct that contains the elements
 of an offense relating to an abusable volatile chemical under
 Sections 485.031 through 485.034, Health and Safety Code;
 (F)  engages in conduct that contains the elements
 of the offense of public lewdness under Section 21.07, Penal Code,
 or indecent exposure under Section 21.08, Penal Code; or
 (G)  engages in conduct that contains the elements
 of the offense of harassment under Section 42.07(a)(1), (2), (3),
 or (7), Penal Code, against an employee of the school district.
 (a-1)  If a disciplinary alternative education program is at
 capacity at the time a student is required to be removed from class
 and placed in the program under Subsection (a) for possession or use
 of an e-cigarette, as defined by Section 161.081, Health and Safety
 Code, and school personnel cannot readily determine that the
 e-cigarette contains a substance described by Subsection
 (a)(2)(C), the student shall be:
 (1)  placed in in-school suspension; and
 (2)  if a position becomes available in the program
 before the expiration of the period of the placement, transferred
 to the program for the remainder of the period.
 (a-2)  If a disciplinary alternative education program is at
 capacity at the time a student is required to be removed from class
 and placed in the program under Subsection (a) for engaging in
 violent conduct, as defined by commissioner rule, a student who has
 been removed to the program for possession or use of an e-cigarette,
 as defined by Section 161.081, Health and Safety Code:
 (1)  may be removed from the program and placed in
 in-school suspension to make a position in the program available
 for the student who engaged in violent conduct; and
 (2)  if removed from the program under Subdivision (1)
 and a position in the program becomes available before the
 expiration of the period of the placement, shall be returned to the
 program for the remainder of the period.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.0065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0065.  E-CIGARETTE EDUCATION REQUIREMENT. (a) In
 this section, "e-cigarette" has the meaning assigned by Section
 161.081, Health and Safety Code.
 (b)  The agency shall develop a program to educate students
 required to be removed from class and placed in a disciplinary
 alternative education program or in in-school suspension under
 Section 37.006 for possession or use of an e-cigarette about the
 risks of substance abuse and use of e-cigarettes. The program may be
 provided in person or online and must include an end-of-course
 assessment.
 (c)  A student described by Subsection (b) must complete the
 program developed under that subsection and achieve a satisfactory
 score on the end-of-course assessment before the student may return
 to class.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2023-2024
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *