Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2440 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 2440


 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that certain plats for the subdivision of
 land include evidence of groundwater supply.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 212.0101, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and
 (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), [If a person
 submits] a plat application for the subdivision of a tract of land
 for which the source of the water supply intended for the
 subdivision is groundwater under that land must[, the municipal
 authority responsible for approving plats by ordinance may require
 the plat application to] have attached to it a statement that:
 (1)  is prepared by an engineer licensed to practice in
 this state or a geoscientist licensed to practice in this state; and
 (2)  certifies that adequate groundwater is available
 for the subdivision.
 (a-1)  A municipal authority responsible for approving plats
 may waive the requirement prescribed by Subsection (a) that a plat
 application have attached to it a statement described by that
 subsection if:
 (1)  based on credible evidence of groundwater
 availability in the vicinity of the proposed subdivision, the
 municipal authority determines that sufficient groundwater is
 available and will continue to be available to the subdivided tract
 of land; and
 (2)  either:
 (A)  the entire tract proposed to be subdivided by
 the plat will be supplied with groundwater from the Gulf Coast
 Aquifer or the Carrizo-Wilcox Aquifer; or
 (B)  the proposed subdivision divides the tract
 into not more than 10 parts.
 (a-2)  A person subject to a waiver authorized by Subsection
 (a-1)(2)(B) regarding a subdivided tract of land must comply with
 the requirements of Subsection (a) if:
 (1)  the tract is subsequently divided in a manner that
 results in the original tract being subdivided into more than 10
 parts; or
 (2)  the municipal authority determines that the
 proposed subdivision is part of a series of proposed subdivisions
 from an original tract that collectively includes more than 10
 parts.
 SECTION 2.  Section 232.0032, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and
 (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), [If a person
 submits] a plat application for the subdivision of a tract of land
 for which the source of the water supply intended for the
 subdivision is groundwater under that land must[, the commissioners
 court of a county by order may require the plat application to] have
 attached to it a statement that:
 (1)  is prepared by an engineer licensed to practice in
 this state or a geoscientist licensed to practice in this state; and
 (2)  certifies that adequate groundwater is available
 for the subdivision.
 (a-1)  A commissioners court may waive the requirement
 prescribed by Subsection (a) that a plat application have attached
 to it a statement described by that subsection if:
 (1)  based on credible evidence of groundwater
 availability in the vicinity of the proposed subdivision, the
 commissioners court determines that sufficient groundwater is
 available and will continue to be available to the subdivided tract
 of land; and
 (2)  either:
 (A)  the entire tract proposed to be subdivided by
 the plat will be supplied with groundwater from the Gulf Coast
 Aquifer or the Carrizo-Wilcox Aquifer; or
 (B)  the proposed subdivision divides the tract
 into not more than 10 parts.
 (a-2)  A person subject to a waiver authorized by Subsection
 (a-1)(2)(B) regarding a subdivided tract of land must comply with
 the requirements of Subsection (a) if:
 (1)  the tract is subsequently divided in a manner that
 results in the original tract being subdivided into more than 10
 parts; or
 (2)  the commissioners court determines that the
 proposed subdivision is part of a series of proposed subdivisions
 from an original tract that collectively includes more than 10
 parts.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a plat application filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A plat application filed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the application was filed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2024.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2440 passed the Senate on
 April 6, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2440 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 120,
 Nays 18, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor