Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB247 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/15/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Alvarado S.B. No. 247
 (In the Senate - Filed November 28, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 15, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 15, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to specialty license plates issued for honorary consuls.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 502.410(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a statement or
 application filed or given under Section 502.060, 502.092, 502.093,
 502.094, 502.095, 504.201, 504.202(b-1), or 504.508[, or 504.515].
 SECTION 2.  Section 504.515, Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *