Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2606 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/06/2023

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             May 6, 2023       TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SB2606 by Creighton (Relating to the creation and operation of a development zone by and the tax revenue received by The Woodlands Township; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and taxes.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2606, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($2,069,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2024($860,000)2025($1,209,000)2026($1,277,000)2027($1,348,000)2028($1,417,000)All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12024($860,000)2025($1,209,000)2026($1,277,000)2027($1,348,000)2028($1,417,000) Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would require The Woodlands Township to be treated as an incorporated municipality for the purposes of allocating a portion of mixed beverage taxes, which would require the CPA to allocate 10.7 percent of the revenue collected from mixed beverage taxes from permittees within the area that is currently retained by the state to the township. This requirement would apply only to taxes received on or after October 1, 2023. The bill would require the CPA to make the first transfer not later than January 31, 2024. The bill would also authorize The Woodlands Township to create a development zone and discontinue one or more existing development zones covering the same area while consolidating assets and debts into the new zone, which would also receive the respective tax allocation payments.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 6, 2023

 

 

  TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SB2606 by Creighton (Relating to the creation and operation of a development zone by and the tax revenue received by The Woodlands Township; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and taxes.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB2606 by Creighton (Relating to the creation and operation of a development zone by and the tax revenue received by The Woodlands Township; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and taxes.), As Introduced

 Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development

 Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 SB2606 by Creighton (Relating to the creation and operation of a development zone by and the tax revenue received by The Woodlands Township; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and taxes.), As Introduced 

 SB2606 by Creighton (Relating to the creation and operation of a development zone by and the tax revenue received by The Woodlands Township; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and taxes.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2606, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($2,069,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2606, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($2,069,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2024 ($860,000)
2025 ($1,209,000)
2026 ($1,277,000)
2027 ($1,348,000)
2028 ($1,417,000)

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2024 ($860,000)
2025 ($1,209,000)
2026 ($1,277,000)
2027 ($1,348,000)
2028 ($1,417,000)

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require The Woodlands Township to be treated as an incorporated municipality for the purposes of allocating a portion of mixed beverage taxes, which would require the CPA to allocate 10.7 percent of the revenue collected from mixed beverage taxes from permittees within the area that is currently retained by the state to the township. This requirement would apply only to taxes received on or after October 1, 2023. The bill would require the CPA to make the first transfer not later than January 31, 2024. The bill would also authorize The Woodlands Township to create a development zone and discontinue one or more existing development zones covering the same area while consolidating assets and debts into the new zone, which would also receive the respective tax allocation payments.



 Methodology

According to the CPA, the revenue losses shown to the General Revenue Fund above are based on mixed beverage tax collections from the area of The Woodlands Township for fiscal year 2022 and projected forward based on the growth of mixed beverage tax revenue. Regarding the development zone, according to the CPA there is not enough information in the bill to determine the fiscal impact of the development zone consolidation; however, since the previous zone would appear to be absorbed into the newly created one, the fiscal impact on the state is likely insignificant.

 Local Government Impact

According to the CPA, The Woodlands Township would see revenue gains equal to the amount of revenue losses to the General Revenue Fund shown above, and the impact as it relates to the development zone consolidation is likely insignificant.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, MOc, AF, CMA, DPE

JMc, MOc, AF, CMA, DPE