Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB267 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2023

                    S.B. No. 267


 AN ACT
 relating to law enforcement agency accreditation, including a grant
 program to assist agencies in becoming accredited.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.0302 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0302.  LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY ACCREDITATION GRANT
 PROGRAM. (a) In this section, "law enforcement agency" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 1701.165, Occupations Code.
 (b)  The comptroller shall establish and administer a grant
 program to provide financial assistance for purposes of becoming
 accredited as required by the rules adopted under Section 1701.165,
 Occupations Code, to each law enforcement agency that employs fewer
 than 250 peace officers.
 (c)  To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a
 law enforcement agency must have executed a contract with an
 accrediting entity described by Section 1701.165(b), Occupations
 Code, and complete an initial assessment by the accrediting entity.
 (d)  Based on the results of the initial assessment completed
 under Subsection (c), a law enforcement agency may request grant
 funds for reimbursement of an accreditation fee, staff overtime, or
 temporary staffing necessary to become accredited.
 (e)  Grant money provided under this section may only be used
 by a law enforcement agency for the purposes of becoming
 accredited. A law enforcement agency may not receive more than one
 grant under this section.
 (f)  The amount of a grant awarded under this section may not
 exceed $30,000.
 (g)  The comptroller shall establish:
 (1)  eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
 (2)  grant application procedures;
 (3)  guidelines relating to grant amounts;
 (4)  procedures for evaluating grant applications,
 including prioritizing applications from law enforcement agencies
 employing fewer than 100 peace officers;
 (5)  procedures for monitoring the use of a grant
 awarded under the program and ensuring compliance with any
 conditions of a grant; and
 (6)  procedures for revoking a grant awarded under the
 program if the law enforcement agency is not accredited within the
 period specified by the rules adopted under Section 1701.165,
 Occupations Code.
 (h)  Not later than December 1 of each year, the comptroller
 shall submit to the Legislative Budget Board a report that provides
 the following information for the preceding state fiscal year:
 (1)  the name of each law enforcement agency that
 applied for a grant under this section; and
 (2)  the amount of money distributed to each law
 enforcement agency that received a grant under this section.
 (i)  The comptroller may use any revenue available for
 purposes of this section.
 (j)  Notwithstanding any other law or rule, beginning
 September 1, 2029, a law enforcement agency must be accredited as
 provided by the rules adopted under Section 1701.165, Occupations
 Code, to be eligible to receive any grant supporting law
 enforcement operations or equipment acquisition administered by
 the comptroller other than a grant under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.165 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.165.  LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY ACCREDITATION. (a)
 In this section, "law enforcement agency" means:
 (1)  a law enforcement agency that employs at least 20
 peace officers described by Article 2.12(1), (3), (4), (8), or
 (10), Code of Criminal Procedure, to answer emergency calls for
 service or conduct patrol operations, traffic enforcement, or
 criminal investigations; or
 (2)  a school district police department.
 (b)  The commission shall adopt rules requiring each law
 enforcement agency to become accredited and maintain
 accreditation:
 (1)  through the Texas Police Chiefs Association Law
 Enforcement Agency Best Practices Accreditation Program;
 (2)  by the Commission on Accreditation for Law
 Enforcement Agencies, Inc.;
 (3)  by the International Association of Campus Law
 Enforcement Administrators;
 (4)  by an accreditation program developed by the
 Sheriffs' Association of Texas; or
 (5)  by an association or organization designated by
 the commission as provided by Subsection (e).
 (c)  The rules adopted under Subsection (b) must require a
 law enforcement agency that is not already accredited to:
 (1)  execute a contract with an approved accrediting
 entity not later than September 1, 2027; and
 (2)  become accredited not later than September 1,
 2029.
 (d)  The commission shall implement a program to assist law
 enforcement agencies in becoming accredited as required by the
 rules adopted under Subsection (b).
 (e)  The commission shall periodically review associations
 and organizations that establish standards of practice for law
 enforcement agencies and that offer accreditation to agencies that
 meet those standards. On a majority vote of the commission that
 accreditation of law enforcement agencies in this state by an
 association or organization would benefit public safety, the
 commission may designate the association or organization as an
 accrediting entity for purposes of Subsection (b)(5).
 (f)  A law enforcement agency shall annually report the
 agency's accreditation status, including the applicable
 accrediting entity described by Subsection (b), to the commission.
 (g)  The commission shall post on the commission's Internet
 website a list of all law enforcement agencies that are currently
 accredited or under contract with an accrediting entity as
 described by Subsection (b).
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2023, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall adopt the rules required by
 Section 1701.165, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2024, the comptroller shall
 establish the grant program required by Section 403.0302,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 267 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 19, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 267 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 16, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
 Nays 5, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor