Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB280 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/29/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini, Hall S.B. No. 280
 (In the Senate - Filed December 14, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 29, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 29, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for members of
 the military who served in Operation Freedom's Sentinel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Marine Lance
 Corporal David Lee Espinoza Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 504.202(e-1), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Other than license plates issued under Subsection
 (h), license plates issued under this section may include, on
 request:
 (1)  the emblem of the veteran's branch of service; or
 (2)  one emblem from another license plate to which the
 person is entitled under Section 504.308, 504.309, 504.310(b),
 504.311, 504.312, 504.313, 504.3135, 504.314, 504.315, 504.316,
 504.3161, 504.318, 504.319, 504.320, 504.323, 504.325, [or]
 504.327, or 504.331.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.331 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.331.  OPERATION FREEDOM'S SENTINEL.  The department
 shall issue specialty license plates for persons who served in the
 United States armed services and participated in Operation
 Freedom's Sentinel. The license plates must include the words
 "Freedom's Sentinel."
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *