Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB315 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/16/2023

                    By: Hall, Kolkhorst S.B. No. 315
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 16, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; March 16, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of telephone call for purposes of
 regulating telephone solicitations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 302.001, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (6-a) to read as follows:
 (6-a)  "Telephone call" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 304.002.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *