Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB336 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2023

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 336
 (In the Senate - Filed December 28, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 April 6, 2023, reported favorably from Committee on Education by
 the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 6, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to compliance programs at public institutions of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.971(a)(1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (1)  "Compliance program" means a process to assess and
 ensure compliance by the officers, [and] employees, agents,
 contractors, subcontractors, or other persons acting on behalf of
 an institution of higher education with applicable laws, rules,
 regulations, and policies, including matters of:
 (A)  ethics and standards of conduct;
 (B)  financial reporting;
 (C)  internal accounting controls; or
 (D)  auditing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *