Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB349 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2023

                    By: Springer S.B. No. 349
 (In the Senate - Filed January 4, 2023; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 March 29, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 29, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county and municipal housing authority pet policies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 392, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 392.0555 to read as follows:
 Sec. 392.0555.  PET OWNERSHIP POLICY. A housing authority
 policy permitting tenant ownership of a pet must comply with all
 applicable county or municipal restrictions on dangerous dogs
 imposed under Section 822.047, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *