Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB380 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/13/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 380
 (In the Senate - Filed January 11, 2023; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 13, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 13, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 380 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to payment of certain court costs associated with
 interpreters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 57.002, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 57.002.  APPOINTMENT OF INTERPRETER OR CART PROVIDER;
 CART PROVIDER LIST; PAYMENT OF INTERPRETER COSTS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 57.002, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  A party to a proceeding in a court who files a statement
 of inability to afford payment of court costs under Rule 145, Texas
 Rules of Civil Procedure, is not required to provide an interpreter
 at the party's expense or pay the costs associated with the services
 of an interpreter appointed under this section that are incurred
 during the course of the action, unless the statement has been
 contested and the court has ordered the party to pay costs pursuant
 to Rule 145. Nothing in this subsection is intended to apply to
 interpreter services or other auxiliary aids for individuals who
 are deaf, hard of hearing, or have communication disabilities,
 which shall be provided to those individuals free of charge
 pursuant to federal and state laws.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies to an
 action pending on the effective date of this Act or filed on or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *