Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB384 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/20/2023

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 384
 (In the Senate - Filed January 12, 2023; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 20, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 March 20, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 384 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale, design, and manufacture of clear aligners.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 431, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 431.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.024.  CLEAR ALIGNERS. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Clear aligner" means a medical device, excluding
 a retainer used to keep teeth in a fixed position, that is:
 (A)  used in orthodontic treatment to move a
 patient's teeth or jaw or correct a misalignment; and
 (B)  manufactured to address the specific
 orthodontic needs of an individual patient.
 (2)  "Dentist" means a person licensed to practice
 dentistry in this state under Subtitle D, Title 3, Occupations
 Code.
 (b)  A person may not sell a clear aligner to a patient in
 this state or provide a service related to the design or manufacture
 of a clear aligner unless the person:
 (1)  is a dentist who has provided the services
 prescribed by Subsection (c) to the patient; or
 (2)  receives written or electronic confirmation from a
 dentist who has provided the services prescribed by Subsection (c)
 to the patient.
 (c)  A person may not sell a clear aligner or provide a
 service related to the design or manufacture of a clear aligner to a
 patient in this state who has not received:
 (1)  an in-person intraoral dental examination and an
 examination of the patient's head and neck;
 (2)  a review of recently performed x-rays, panoramic
 x-rays, computed tomography, bone imaging scans, or other
 appropriate diagnostic imaging sufficient to allow the dentist to
 detect patient conditions that preclude or contraindicate the
 provision of safe orthodontic treatment, including:
 (A)  untreated caries;
 (B)  gingivitis and periodontal disease;
 (C)  issues with the roots of teeth in the
 periodontium, including short roots;
 (D)  the presence of an osseointegrated dental
 implant or other fixed dental appliance;
 (E)  fractured, cracked, or split teeth or roots;
 or
 (F)  any other oral pathology or condition that
 precludes orthodontic treatment;
 (3)  a prescription for a clear aligner issued by:
 (A)  the dentist who provided the examination
 described by Subdivision (1) and reviewed the appropriate
 diagnostic imaging described by Subdivision (2); or
 (B)  the dentist who:
 (i)  will conduct and monitor the patient's
 orthodontic treatment; and
 (ii)  has either:
 (a)  received a referral from the
 patient's dentist described by Paragraph (A); or
 (b)  requested, received, and
 maintained clearance for orthodontic treatment from the patient's
 dentist described by Paragraph (A);
 (4)  subject to Subsection (d), counsel by a dentist
 described by Subdivision (3) regarding available orthodontic
 treatment options and the risks associated with those treatments;
 and
 (5)  a review of the patient's medical and dental health
 histories.
 (d)  The required counsel under Subsection (c)(4) is valid
 only if the patient acknowledges and verifies in writing, with the
 patient's signature, that the patient received the counsel. The
 dentist providing the required counsel shall attach and maintain
 the patient's written acknowledgment of counsel in the patient's
 file.
 (e)  A person who sells a clear aligner to a patient or
 provides a service related to the design or manufacture of a clear
 aligner shall maintain any documents received under Subsection (c)
 for not less than seven years after the date of sale or provision of
 services.
 SECTION 2.  Section 431.024, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to services related to the design or
 manufacture of a clear aligner that are provided or a clear aligner
 sold on or after the effective date of this Act. Services related
 to the design or manufacture of a clear aligner that are provided or
 a clear aligner sold before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *