Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB426 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/31/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Paxton, Hall S.B. No. 426
 (In the Senate - Filed January 12, 2023; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 31, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to patient access to prescription drugs for off-label use
 for COVID-19 treatment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) This Act shall be known as the Right to Treat
 Act.
 (b)  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  the relationship between a physician and patient
 is valued;
 (2)  during the COVID-19 pandemic, many patients have
 been frustrated to learn that their physicians are discouraged from
 prescribing, administering, or dispensing for off-label use
 prescription drugs that may aid in the patient's treatment of and
 recovery from COVID-19; and
 (3)  this Act is intended to enable a patient to access
 and a physician to prescribe, administer, and dispense for
 off-label use prescription drugs that may aid in the patient's
 treatment of and recovery from COVID-19.
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle C, Title 6, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 490 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 490. OFF-LABEL USE OF PRESCRIPTION DRUGS FOR COVID-19
 TREATMENT
 Sec. 490.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "COVID-19" means the 2019 novel coronavirus
 disease.
 (2)  "Off-label use" means the use of a prescription
 drug approved for use by the United States Food and Drug
 Administration in a manner other than the approved use.
 (3)  "Physician" means an individual licensed to
 practice medicine in this state.
 Sec. 490.002.  APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies only to
 the prescribing, administering, and dispensing of a prescription
 drug the United States Food and Drug Administration has approved
 for human use.
 Sec. 490.003.  PROHIBITED STATE INTERFERENCE WITH PATIENT
 ACCESS TO OFF-LABEL USE OF PRESCRIPTION DRUG. An official,
 employee, or agent of this state may not prohibit or restrict a
 physician from prescribing, administering, or dispensing for
 off-label use a prescription drug to treat a patient who is exposed
 to or diagnosed with COVID-19.
 Sec. 490.004.  NO CAUSE OF ACTION CREATED. This chapter does
 not create a private or state cause of action against a manufacturer
 of a prescription drug approved by the Federal Drug Administration
 or against a physician or any other person involved in the care of a
 patient who is exposed to or diagnosed with COVID-19 for any harm to
 the patient resulting from the off-label use of the drug in the
 treatment of COVID-19.
 Sec. 490.005.  PROHIBITED ACTION AGAINST PHYSICIAN'S
 LICENSE. Notwithstanding any other law, the Texas Medical Board
 may not revoke, fail to renew, suspend, or take any other adverse
 action against a physician's license under Subchapter B, Chapter
 164, Occupations Code, based solely on the physician's prescribing,
 administering, or dispensing a prescription drug for off-label use
 to treat a patient who is exposed to or diagnosed with COVID-19,
 provided the physician's treatment of the patient meets the medical
 standard of care.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *