Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB464 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

                    By: Parker S.B. No. 464
 (In the Senate - Filed January 13, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 March 30, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating October 17 as Entrepreneurs with
 Disabilities Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Blake Pyron Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.081 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.081.  ENTREPRENEURS WITH DISABILITIES DAY. (a)
 October 17 is Entrepreneurs with Disabilities Day to recognize
 entrepreneurship as a career path for all people with disabilities
 and bring awareness and inclusion to every aspect of the workforce.
 (b)  Entrepreneurs with Disabilities Day may be regularly
 observed by appropriate ceremonies, activities, and programs.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *