Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB471 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2023

                    By: Springer S.B. No. 471
 (In the Senate - Filed January 13, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture &
 Rural Affairs; April 19, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 471 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the investigation by the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality of certain complaints.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.176, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The commission is not required to investigate a
 complaint:
 (1)  that may be addressed during other commission
 activities; or
 (2)  that was filed by an individual when there is not a
 reasonable probability that the commission can substantiate the
 complaint and:
 (A)  the complaint is repetitious or redundant of
 other complaints concerning the same site investigated in the
 preceding 12 months that were not substantiated by the commission;
 or
 (B)  the complainant has filed in the preceding
 seven years at least five complaints that were not substantiated by
 the commission.
 SECTION 2.  Section 5.177(c), Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (c)  The commission is not required to provide the
 information described in Subsection (a) or (b) to a complainant
 who:
 (1)  files an anonymous complaint;
 (2)  [or] provides inaccurate contact information; or
 (3)  files a complaint described by Section 5.176(c).
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a complaint filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *