Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB491 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 491
 (In the Senate - Filed January 18, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 20, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; April 20, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 491 By:  Springer


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to building height restrictions in certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 214, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 214.908 to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.908.  LIMITATION ON BUILDING HEIGHT RESTRICTION.
 (a) This section applies only to a municipality with a population
 of more than 725,000.
 (b)  A municipality may not adopt or enforce an ordinance,
 regulation, or other measure that limits the height of a building
 based on the building's proximity to a lot that is located more than
 50 feet from the building.
 (c)  The prohibition described by Subsection (b) applies to a
 zoning regulation that limits the maximum building height
 authorized for a lot.
 (d)  For purposes of this section, the proximity of a
 building to a lot is measured along the shortest straight line
 between the building and the lot's lot line.
 (e)  This section does not affect the application of a
 restriction or regulation imposed by:
 (1)  Chapter 3151, Government Code;
 (2)  federal law, including a restriction or regulation
 affecting a military base or airport;
 (3)  a municipality that contains a World Heritage Site
 declared by the United Nations Educational, Scientific and Cultural
 Organization and intended to protect a building or area designated
 for protection based on the building's or area's historical,
 cultural, or architectural importance and significance; or
 (4)  a municipality related to the height of a building
 near an airport, including a military airport, commercial service
 airport, or joint-use airport.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *