S.B. No. 500 AN ACT relating to the value of a residential dwelling offered or awarded as a prize at a charitable raffle. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 2002.056(b-1), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (b-1) The value of a residential dwelling offered or awarded as a prize at a raffle that is purchased by the organization or for which the organization provides any consideration may not exceed $750,000 [$250,000]. SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only to a charitable raffle conducted under Chapter 2002, Occupations Code, for which a residential dwelling is offered or awarded as a prize on or after the effective date of this Act. A charitable raffle conducted under Chapter 2002, Occupations Code, for which a residential dwelling is offered or awarded as a prize before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the prize was offered or awarded, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the Senate on April 6, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 2, 2023, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 5, 2023, House granted request of the Senate; May 17, 2023, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the House, with amendments, on April 21, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 109, Nays 30, one present not voting; May 5, 2023, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 15, 2023, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 21, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor